PA SB1422 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on July 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-02 - Act No. 112
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on July 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-02 - Act No. 112
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 42 (Judiciary and Judicial Procedure) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in particular rights and immunities, providing for successor business entity liability.
Title
In particular rights and immunities, providing for successor business entity liability.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-17 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-02 | House | Act No. 112 |
2014-07-02 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2014-06-30 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2014-06-30 | House | Signed in House |
2014-06-30 | House | Signed in Senate |
2014-06-30 | House | Third consideration and final passage (201-2) |
2014-06-30 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2014-06-29 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2014-06-29 | House | Second consideration |
2014-06-28 | House | Removed from table |
2014-06-27 | House | Laid on the table |
2014-06-27 | House | First consideration |
2014-06-27 | House | Reported as committed |
2014-06-24 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2014-06-23 | House | In the House |
2014-06-23 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2014-06-18 | Senate | Second consideration |
2014-06-17 | Senate | First consideration |
2014-06-17 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2014-06-16 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |