PA SB1413 | 2007-2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on October 8 2008 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-10-15 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Status: Engrossed on October 8 2008 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-10-15 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Summary
An Act amending Title 75 (Vehicles) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, further providing for revocation of habitual offender's license, for driving while operating privilege is suspended or revoked, for permitting violation of title, for homicide by vehicle and for habitual offenders.
Title
An Act amending Title 75 (Vehicles) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, further providing for revocation of habitual offender's license, for driving while operating privilege is suspended or revoked, for permitting violation of title, for homicide by vehicle and for habitual offenders.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-10-15 | Referred to TRANSPORTATION | |
2008-10-08 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2008-10-07 | Second consideration | |
2008-10-06 | Re-reported as amended | |
2008-06-26 | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2008-06-10 | First consideration | |
2008-06-10 | Reported as committed | |
2008-05-14 | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
Pennsylvania State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2007&sind=0&body=S&type=B&bn=1413 |