PA SB1402 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-11-01 - Act No. 211
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-11-01 - Act No. 211
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending Title 30 (Fish) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, further providing for the definition of "fishing," for organization of commission, for deputy waterways conservation officers and for volunteer program; providing for damage to property; further providing for control of property, for powers and duties of waterways conservation officers and deputies and for enforcement of other laws; providing for unlawful use of computer and for liability for conduct of another and for complicity; further providing for suspension of privileges pending payment of penalties, for misuse of property and waters, for littering, for possession and display of licenses, for lost fishing licenses, for institutional licenses, for exemptions from license requirements, for eel chute licenses, for net permits, for boat and net licenses for boundary lakes, for penalties, for fees, for boating education, for general boating regulations, for chemical testing to determine amount of alcohol or controlled substance and for period of registration; providing for unauthorized operation of boats, for permitting violations and for duties of operators involved in boating accidents; and making editorial changes.
Title
Further providing for the definition of "fishing," for organization of commission, for deputy waterways conservation officers and for volunteer program; providing for damage to property; further providing for control of property, for powers and duties of waterways conservation officers and deputies and for enforcement of other laws; providing for unlawful use of computer and for liability for conduct of another and for complicity; further providing for suspension of privileges pending payment of penalties, for misuse of property and waters, for littering, for possession and display of licenses, for lost fishing licenses, for institutional licenses, for exemptions from license requirements, for eel chute licenses, for net permits, for boat and net licenses for boundary lakes, for penalties, for fees, for boating education, for general boating regulations, for chemical testing to determine amount of alcohol or controlled substance and for period of registration; providing for unauthorized operation of boats, for permitting violations and for duties of operators involved in boating accidents; and making editorial changes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-10-17 - House - SB 1402 PN 2415, FP (Y: 121 N: 70 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2012-10-02 - Senate - SB 1402 PN 2415, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-09-25 - Senate - Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-05 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-10-02 - Senate - SB 1402 PN 2415, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-09-25 - Senate - Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-05 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-11-01 | House | Act No. 211 |
2012-11-01 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2012-10-24 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2012-10-24 | House | Signed in House |
2012-10-17 | House | Signed in Senate |
2012-10-17 | House | Third consideration and final passage (121-70) |
2012-10-17 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2012-10-16 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2012-10-16 | House | Second consideration |
2012-10-15 | House | Removed from table |
2012-10-03 | House | Laid on the table |
2012-10-03 | House | First consideration |
2012-10-03 | House | Reported as committed |
2012-10-03 | House | Referred to GAME AND FISHERIES |
2012-10-02 | House | In the House |
2012-10-02 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2012-10-01 | Senate | Second consideration |
2012-09-25 | Senate | Re-reported as amended |
2012-06-25 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2012-06-05 | Senate | First consideration |
2012-06-05 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2012-01-31 | Senate | Referred to GAME AND FISHERIES |