PA SB1401 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-09 - Act No. 124
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-09 - Act No. 124
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act renaming the West Chestnut Street Bridge in Coudersport Borough, Potter County, as the Private Edwin Tubbs Memorial Bridge; renaming the State Route 872 Bridge near Coudersport Borough/Eulalia Township Border, Potter County, as the Specialist Donald Stiles Memorial Bridge; designating a bridge on that portion of S.R. 49 over the Cowanesque River between Dennis Hill Road and Church Street in Harrison Township, Potter County, as the Private First Class Roger P. Downey Memorial Bridge; designating a bridge on that portion of State Route 56, partially in Seward Borough, Westmoreland County, and partially in East Wheatfield Township, Indiana County, over the Conemaugh River as the Pfc. James E. Ludwig Memorial Bridge; designating a portion of Pennsylvania Route 263 in Bucks County as the Officer Bradley M. Fox Memorial Highway; designating a portion of Bushkill Center Road in Northampton County as the Veterans Memorial Highway; and designating a bridge to be constructed on that portion of State Route 903 over the Lehigh River, Jim Thorpe Borough, Carbon County, as the Sgt. Andrew J. "AJ" Baddick Memorial Bridge.
Title
Renaming the West Chestnut Street Bridge in Coudersport Borough, Potter County, as the Private Edwin Tubbs Memorial Bridge; renaming the State Route 872 Bridge near Coudersport Borough/Eulalia Township Border, Potter County, as the Specialist Donald Stiles Memorial Bridge; designating a bridge on that portion of S.R. 49 over the Cowanesque River between Dennis Hill Road and Church Street in Harrison Township, Potter County, as the Private First Class Roger P. Downey Memorial Bridge; designating a bridge on that portion of State Route 56, partially in Seward Borough, Westmoreland County, and partially in East Wheatfield Township, Indiana County, over the Conemaugh River as the Pfc. James E. Ludwig Memorial Bridge; designating a portion of Pennsylvania Route 263 in Bucks County as the Officer Bradley M. Fox Memorial Highway; designating a portion of Bushkill Center Road in Northampton County as the Veterans Memorial Highway; and designating a bridge to be constructed on that portion of State Route 903 over the Lehigh River, Jim Thorpe Borough, Carbon County, as the Sgt. Andrew J. "AJ" Baddick Memorial Bridge.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-07-08 - Senate - Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-04 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-04 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-09 | Senate | Act No. 124 |
2014-07-09 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2014-07-09 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2014-07-09 | Senate | Signed in House |
2014-07-08 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2014-07-08 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments (48-0) |
2014-07-08 | Senate | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2014-07-08 | Senate | Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS |
2014-07-02 | Senate | In the Senate |
2014-07-02 | House | Final passage (199-0) |
2014-07-02 | House | Third consideration, with amendments |
2014-07-01 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2014-06-30 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2014-06-30 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2014-06-28 | House | Removed from table |
2014-06-27 | House | Laid on the table |
2014-06-27 | House | First consideration |
2014-06-27 | House | Reported as committed |
2014-06-19 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2014-06-17 | House | In the House |
2014-06-17 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2014-06-10 | Senate | Second consideration |
2014-06-04 | Senate | First consideration |
2014-06-04 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2014-06-02 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |