PA SB1398 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Introduced on June 9 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-10-12 - Re-referred to URBAN AFFAIRS AND HOUSING
Pending: Senate Urban Affairs & Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 9 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-10-12 - Re-referred to URBAN AFFAIRS AND HOUSING
Pending: Senate Urban Affairs & Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending the act of July 9, 1971 (P.L.206, No.34), known as the Improvement of Deteriorating Real Property or Areas Tax Exemption Act, defining "depressed area"; and expanding applicability of the act to certain depressed areas.
Title
Defining "depressed area"; and expanding applicability of the act to certain depressed areas.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-10-12 | Re-referred to URBAN AFFAIRS AND HOUSING | |
2010-09-28 | First consideration | |
2010-09-28 | Reported as committed | |
2010-06-09 | Referred to GAME AND FISHERIES |