PA SB1340 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on October 17 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-10-18 - Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 17 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-10-18 - Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act authorizing the Department of General Services, with the approval of the Governor, to grant and convey, at a price to be determined through a competitive bid process, certain lands, buildings and improvements situate in South Strabane Township, Washington County, and to grant and convey to the Bradford House Historical Association certain lands situate in the City of Washington, Washington County.
Title
Authorizing the Department of General Services, with the approval of the Governor, to grant and convey, at a price to be determined through a competitive bid process, certain lands, buildings and improvements situate in South Strabane Township, Washington County, and to grant and convey to the Bradford House Historical Association certain lands situate in the City of Washington, Washington County.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-10-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1340 PN 2091, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-27 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-27 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-10-18 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |
2016-10-17 | House | In the House |
2016-10-17 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2016-09-28 | Senate | Second consideration |
2016-09-27 | Senate | First consideration |
2016-09-27 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2016-06-29 | Senate | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |