PA SB1309 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-25 - Act No. 139
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act authorizing the Department of Transportation, with the approval of the Governor, to grant and convey to High Properties, LP, a certain tract of unimproved land situate in Manheim Township, Lancaster County.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizing the Department of Transportation, with the approval of the Governor, to grant and convey to High Properties, LP, a certain tract of unimproved land situate in Manheim Township, Lancaster County.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-11-18 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-18 - House - House Floor: SB 1309 PN 1930, FP (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-30 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1309 PN 1930, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-09 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-11-25HouseAct No. 139
2020-11-25HouseApproved by the Governor
2020-11-20HousePresented to the Governor
2020-11-19HouseSigned in House
2020-11-18HouseSigned in Senate
2020-11-18HouseThird consideration and final passage (202-0)
2020-11-18HouseRe-reported as committed
2020-10-21HouseRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2020-10-21HouseSecond consideration
2020-10-20HouseRemoved from table
2020-09-30HouseLaid on the table
2020-09-30HouseFirst consideration
2020-09-30HouseReported as committed
2020-09-23HouseReferred to STATE GOVERNMENT
2020-09-22HouseIn the House
2020-09-22SenateThird consideration and final passage (49-0)
2020-09-21SenateSecond consideration
2020-09-09SenateFirst consideration
2020-09-09SenateReported as committed
2020-09-08SenateReferred to STATE GOVERNMENT

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=S&type=B&bn=1309
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=1309&pn=1930
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=41&theDate=09/09/2020&RollCallId=1114
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=642
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=36&theDate=09/30/2020&RollCallId=2546
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1724
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=11/18/2020&RollCallId=2636

Bill Comments

feedback