PA SB130 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-12-04 - Act No. 72
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-12-04 - Act No. 72
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 42 (Judiciary and Judicial Procedure) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, providing for sentence of community service.
Title
Providing for sentence of community service.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-11-23 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-23 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-23 - House - House Floor: SB 130 PN 77, FP (Y: 196 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-11-17 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-17 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-02 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 130 PN 77, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-23 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-23 - House - House Floor: SB 130 PN 77, FP (Y: 196 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-11-17 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-17 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-02 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 130 PN 77, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-04 | House | Act No. 72 |
2015-12-04 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2015-11-24 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2015-11-24 | House | Signed in House |
2015-11-23 | House | Signed in Senate |
2015-11-23 | House | Third consideration and final passage (196-0) |
2015-11-23 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2015-11-19 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2015-11-19 | House | Second consideration |
2015-11-18 | House | Removed from table |
2015-11-17 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-11-17 | House | First consideration |
2015-11-17 | House | Reported as committed |
2015-03-04 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2015-03-02 | House | In the House |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (48-0) |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Second consideration |
2015-02-17 | Senate | First consideration |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2015-01-14 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |