PA SB1275 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-09 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-09 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending Title 61 (Penal and Correctional Institutions) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in Pennsylvania Board of Probation and Parole, further providing for violation of terms of parole.
Title
In Pennsylvania Board of Probation and Parole, further providing for violation of terms of parole.
Sponsors
Sen. Patrick Browne [R] | Sen. Jane Earll [R] | Sen. Edwin Erickson [R] | Sen. Stewart Greenleaf [R] |
Sen. Christine Tartaglione [D] | Sen. Leanna Washington [D] | Sen. John Wozniak [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-06-08 - Senate - SB 1275 PN 1764, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 45 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-09 | Referred to JUDICIARY | |
2010-06-08 | In the House | |
2010-06-08 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2010-05-26 | Second consideration | |
2010-05-24 | Re-reported as committed | |
2010-04-20 | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2010-04-13 | First consideration | |
2010-04-13 | Reported as committed | |
2010-03-15 | Referred to JUDICIARY |