PA SB127 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-10 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-10 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending the act of April 14, 1972 (P.L.233, No.64), known as The Controlled Substance, Drug, Device and Cosmetic Act, providing for the offenses of operating a methamphetamine laboratory and illegal dumping of methamphetamine waste.
Title
Providing for the offenses of operating a methamphetamine laboratory and illegal dumping of methamphetamine waste.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-03-09 - Senate - SB 127 PN 100, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-10 | Referred to JUDICIARY | |
2009-03-09 | In the House | |
2009-03-09 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2009-02-11 | Second consideration | |
2009-02-10 | First consideration | |
2009-02-10 | Reported as committed | |
2009-01-30 | Referred to JUDICIARY |