PA SB1236 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on July 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-07 - Act No. 52 of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on July 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-07 - Act No. 52 of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 3 (Agriculture) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, providing for extensive amendments to the very small meat processor Federal inspection reimbursement grant program; in agriculture and youth development, further providing for definitions and for grants; in Commonwealth Specialty Crop Block Grant Program, further providing for Commonwealth Specialty Crop Block Grant Fund; in Urban Agricultural Infrastructure Grant Program, further providing for legislative intent, for definitions, for grant program and for distribution of grant money; and, in Farm-to-School Program, further providing for findings and declarations, for grant program and for applications and review of applications.
Title
Providing for extensive amendments to the very small meat processor Federal inspection reimbursement grant program; in agriculture and youth development, further providing for definitions and for grants; in Commonwealth Specialty Crop Block Grant Program, further providing for Commonwealth Specialty Crop Block Grant Fund; in Urban Agricultural Infrastructure Grant Program, further providing for legislative intent, for definitions, for grant program and for distribution of grant money; and, in Farm-to-School Program, further providing for findings and declarations, for grant program and for applications and review of applications.
Sponsors
Sen. Elder Vogel [R] | Sen. Judy Schwank [D] | Sen. Cris Dush [R] | Sen. John Gordner [R] |
Sen. Robert Mensch [R] | Sen. Patrick Stefano [R] | Sen. Judith Ward [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-28 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1236 PN 1777, Concur in House Amendments (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - House - House Floor: SB 1236 PN 1777, FP (Y: 199 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-06-15 - House - House Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-15 - House - House Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Adopt Amendment A04780 (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1236 PN 1678, Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-06 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - Senate - Senate Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Reported as Amended A04288 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1236 PN 1777, Concur in House Amendments (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - House - House Floor: SB 1236 PN 1777, FP (Y: 199 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-06-15 - House - House Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-15 - House - House Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Adopt Amendment A04780 (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1236 PN 1678, Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-06 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - Senate - Senate Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Reported as Amended A04288 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-07 | Senate | Act No. 52 of 2022 |
2022-07-07 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2022-06-29 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2022-06-29 | Senate | Signed in House |
2022-06-28 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2022-06-28 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments (49-0) |
2022-06-28 | Senate | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2022-06-28 | Senate | Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS |
2022-06-22 | Senate | In the Senate |
2022-06-22 | House | Third consideration and final passage (199-0) |
2022-06-22 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2022-06-21 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-06-21 | House | Second consideration |
2022-06-20 | House | Removed from table |
2022-06-15 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-06-15 | House | First consideration |
2022-06-15 | House | Reported as amended |
2022-06-08 | House | Referred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS |
2022-06-07 | House | In the House |
2022-06-07 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2022-06-06 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2022-05-25 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-05-25 | Senate | Second consideration |
2022-05-24 | Senate | First consideration |
2022-05-24 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2022-05-18 | Senate | Referred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS |