PA SB1224 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-10-14 - Act No. 147
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-10-14 - Act No. 147
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 51 (Military Affairs) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in long-term care patient access to pharmaceuticals, further providing for assisted living residence and personal care home.
Title
In long-term care patient access to pharmaceuticals, further providing for assisted living residence and personal care home.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-29 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-10-14 | House | Act No. 147 |
2014-10-14 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2014-10-07 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2014-10-07 | House | Signed in House |
2014-10-06 | House | Signed in Senate |
2014-10-06 | House | Third consideration and final passage (198-0) |
2014-09-23 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2014-09-22 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2014-09-22 | House | Second consideration |
2014-09-17 | House | Removed from table |
2014-09-10 | House | Laid on the table |
2014-09-10 | House | Removed from table |
2014-06-18 | House | Laid on the table |
2014-06-18 | House | First consideration |
2014-06-18 | House | Reported as committed |
2014-05-06 | House | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |
2014-05-05 | House | In the House |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Second consideration |
2014-04-29 | Senate | First consideration |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Corrective Reprint, Printer's No. 1950 |
2014-01-17 | Senate | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |