PA SB1209 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-3)
Status: Passed on October 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-24 - Act No. 164
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-3)
Status: Passed on October 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-24 - Act No. 164
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of November 29, 2006 (P.L.1471, No.165), known as the Sexual Assault Testing and Evidence Collection Act, further providing for sexual assault evidence collection program; and requiring the Pennsylvania State Police to complete and submit a report.
Title
Further providing for sexual assault evidence collection program; and requiring the Pennsylvania State Police to complete and submit a report.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-10-16 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-16 - House - House Floor: SB 1209 PN 1886, FP (Y: 189 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-10-09 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1209 PN 1886, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-24 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-16 - House - House Floor: SB 1209 PN 1886, FP (Y: 189 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-10-09 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1209 PN 1886, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-24 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-10-24 | House | Act No. 164 |
2018-10-24 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2018-10-17 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2018-10-17 | House | Signed in House |
2018-10-16 | House | Signed in Senate |
2018-10-16 | House | Third consideration and final passage (189-0) |
2018-10-16 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2018-10-15 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2018-10-15 | House | Second consideration |
2018-10-11 | House | Removed from table |
2018-10-09 | House | Laid on the table |
2018-10-09 | House | First consideration |
2018-10-09 | House | Reported as committed |
2018-10-01 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2018-09-26 | House | In the House |
2018-09-26 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (48-0) |
2018-09-24 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2018-06-21 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2018-06-21 | Senate | Second consideration |
2018-06-18 | Senate | First consideration |
2018-06-18 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2018-06-15 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |