PA SB1195 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on October 26 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-10-26 - Presented to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of May 17, 1921 (P.L.682, No.284), known as The Insurance Company Law of 1921, in general provisions relating to insurance companies,

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In general provisions relating to insurance companies,

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-10-21 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-21 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1195 PN 2041, CONCUR IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-21 - House - House Floor: SB 1195 PN 2041, FP (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-09-30 - House - House Insurance: Adopt Amendment A07310 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-30 - House - House Insurance: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1195 PN 1825, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-29 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Senate - Senate Banking And Insurance: Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-10-26SenatePresented to the Governor
2020-10-26SenateSigned in House
2020-10-21SenateSigned in Senate
2020-10-21SenateSenate concurred in House amendments (47-0)
2020-10-21SenateRe-reported on concurrence, as committed
2020-10-21SenateReferred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS
2020-10-21SenateIn the Senate
2020-10-21HouseThird consideration and final passage (201-0)
2020-10-21HouseRe-reported as committed
2020-10-20HouseRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2020-10-20HouseSecond consideration
2020-10-19HouseRemoved from table
2020-09-30HouseLaid on the table
2020-09-30HouseFirst consideration
2020-09-30HouseReported as amended
2020-07-08HouseReferred to INSURANCE
2020-06-30HouseIn the House
2020-06-30SenateThird consideration and final passage (50-0)
2020-06-29SenateRe-reported as amended
2020-06-24SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2020-06-24SenateSecond consideration, with amendments
2020-06-10SenateFirst consideration
2020-06-10SenateReported as committed
2020-06-09SenateReferred to BANKING AND INSURANCE

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=S&type=B&bn=1195
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=1195&pn=1762
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=1195&pn=1821
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=1195&pn=1825
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=1195&pn=2041
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=37&theDate=06/10/2020&RollCallId=960
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=06/29/2020&RollCallId=1037
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=574
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=22&theDate=09/30/2020&RollCallId=2527
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=22&theDate=09/30/2020&RollCallId=2526
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1703
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=718
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=17&theDate=10/21/2020&RollCallId=1270
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=10/21/2020&RollCallId=2615

Bill Comments

feedback