PA SB1187 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-02 - Act No. 109
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-02 - Act No. 109
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 75 (Vehicles) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in registration of vehicles, further providing for period of registration, for person with disability plate and placard, for antique, classic and collectible plates, for veteran plates and placard, for special plates for recipients of Purple Heart, for special plates for Pearl Harbor survivors, for special plates for veterans of Korean War, for special plates for recipients of Korean Defense Service Medal, for special plates for veterans of Persian Gulf War, for wild resource conservation plate, for Appalachian Trail organization registration plates and for preserve our heritage registration plate, providing for Pennsylvania Monuments registration plate and for United States Olympic plate, further providing for zoological plate, providing for Pennsylvania Hunting Heritage registration plates, further providing for special plates for recipients of Expeditionary Forces Medal, for special plates for World War II veterans, for special plates for individuals in the service of the United States Merchant Marine, for special plates for steelworkers, for special plates for veterans of Vietnam Conflict, for Operation Iraqi Freedom veterans plate, for Operation Enduring Freedom veterans plate, for special plates for veterans, for Gold Star Family plate, for special plates for United States military airborne units, and providing for special plates for recipients of Combat Action Badge, Combat Infantryman Badge, Combat Action Ribbon, Combat Action Medal or Combat Medical Badge and for Special "In God We Trust" plates; and, in fees, further providing for personal registration plates.
Title
In registration of vehicles, further providing for period of registration, for person with disability plate and placard, for antique, classic and collectible plates, for veteran plates and placard, for special plates for recipients of Purple Heart, for special plates for Pearl Harbor survivors, for special plates for veterans of Korean War, for special plates for recipients of Korean Defense Service Medal, for special plates for veterans of Persian Gulf War, for wild resource conservation plate, for Appalachian Trail organization registration plates and for preserve our heritage registration plate, providing for Pennsylvania Monuments registration plate and for United States Olympic plate, further providing for zoological plate, providing for Pennsylvania Hunting Heritage registration plates, further providing for special plates for recipients of Expeditionary Forces Medal, for special plates for World War II veterans, for special plates for individuals in the service of the United States Merchant Marine, for special plates for steelworkers, for special plates for veterans of Vietnam Conflict, for Operation Iraqi Freedom veterans plate, for Operation Enduring Freedom veterans plate, for special plates for veterans, for Gold Star Family plate, for special plates for United States military airborne units, and providing for special plates for recipients of Combat Action Badge, Combat Infantryman Badge, Combat Action Ribbon, Combat Action Medal or Combat Medical Badge and for Special "In God We Trust" plates; and, in fees, further providing for personal registration plates.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-29 - Senate - Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-27 - Senate - Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-04 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-27 - Senate - Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-04 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-02 | Senate | Act No. 109 |
2014-07-02 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2014-06-30 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2014-06-30 | Senate | Signed in House |
2014-06-30 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2014-06-30 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments (50-0) |
2014-06-29 | Senate | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2014-06-28 | Senate | Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS |
2014-06-27 | Senate | In the Senate |
2014-06-27 | House | Third consideration and final passage (201-1) |
2014-06-27 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2014-06-26 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2014-06-26 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2014-06-24 | House | Removed from table |
2014-06-18 | House | Laid on the table |
2014-06-18 | House | First consideration |
2014-06-18 | House | Reported as amended |
2014-03-11 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2014-03-10 | House | In the House |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (48-0) |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Second consideration |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Re-reported as amended |
2013-12-11 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2013-12-04 | Senate | First consideration |
2013-12-04 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2013-11-20 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |