PA SB1184 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 29 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-30 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 29 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-30 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending Title 75 (Vehicles) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in driving after imbibing alcohol or utilizing drugs, further providing for occupational limited license, for penalties, for ignition interlock and for illegally operating a motor vehicle not equipped with ignition interlock.
Title
In driving after imbibing alcohol or utilizing drugs, further providing for occupational limited license, for penalties, for ignition interlock and for illegally operating a motor vehicle not equipped with ignition interlock.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-11 - Senate - Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 23 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-10-18 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-10-18 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-30 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2012-06-27 | Senate | Removed from table |
2012-06-27 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2012-06-12 | Senate | Second consideration |
2012-06-11 | Senate | Re-reported as amended |
2011-10-31 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2011-10-18 | Senate | First consideration |
2011-10-18 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2011-06-29 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |