PA SB118 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Passed on November 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-11-03 - Act No. 144 of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Passed on November 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-11-03 - Act No. 144 of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 42 (Judiciary and Judicial Procedure) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in sentencing, further providing for sexual offenses and tier system.
Title
In sentencing, further providing for sexual offenses and tier system.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-10-24 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-10-24 - House - House Floor: SB 118 PN 89, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 184 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-27 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-12 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 118 PN 89, Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-11 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Committed (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-10-24 - House - House Floor: SB 118 PN 89, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 184 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-27 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-12 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 118 PN 89, Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-11 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Committed (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-03 | House | Act No. 144 of 2022 |
2022-11-03 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2022-10-25 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2022-10-25 | House | Signed in House |
2022-10-24 | House | Signed in Senate |
2022-10-24 | House | Third consideration and final passage (184-16) |
2022-10-24 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2022-09-21 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-09-21 | House | Second consideration |
2022-09-20 | House | Removed from table |
2022-06-27 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-06-27 | House | First consideration |
2022-06-27 | House | Reported as committed |
2022-04-14 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2022-04-12 | House | In the House |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (47-2) |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Second consideration |
2022-04-05 | Senate | First consideration |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |