PA SB117 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-02 - Act No. 59
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-02 - Act No. 59
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act designating a bridge on that portion of State Route 3016 (Bedford Street) over Solomon Run in the City of Johnstown, Cambria County, as the Seaman Apprentice Kenneth D. Scaife Memorial Bridge; designating a bridge on that portion of Peg Run Road, Pennsylvania Route 240, over the West Branch of the Susquehanna River, Susquehanna Township, Cambria County, as the United States Army Sergeant Scott O. Henry Memorial Bridge; designating a portion of U.S. Route 220 in Sullivan County from the intersection with Pennsylvania Route 87 to the Bradford County line as the T.W. "Doc" Shoemaker Memorial Highway; designating a bridge on that portion of Pennsylvania Route 14 over Fall Brook, Troy Borough, Bradford County, as the Troy Area Veterans Memorial Bridge; designating a bridge on that portion of Pennsylvania Route 305 over Shaver's Creek in Barree Township, Huntingdon County, as the Private Harold E. "Jim" Knode Memorial Bridge; designating a bridge on that portion of Pennsylvania Route 453 over the Little Juniata River, Tyrone Township, Blair County, as the Robert E. Gensimore Memorial Bridge; designating a bridge on that portion of Pennsylvania Route 899 over the Clarion River connecting Barnett Township, Jefferson County, and Barnett Township, Forest County, as the PFC Patrick T. Cassatt Memorial Bridge; designating a bridge on that portion of State Route 4018 over the Little Mahoning Creek, South Mahoning Township, Indiana County, as the SP4 Franklin Delano Meyer Memorial Bridge; designating a bridge identified as Bridge Key 54683 on that portion of State Route 3009 (Kushequa Avenue) over the Kinzua Creek in Kushequa, Hamlin Township, McKean County, as the Vietnam Veterans Memorial Bridge; designating the bridge identified as Bridge Key 18676 on that portion of Pennsylvania Route 747 over the Juniata River in Mount Union Borough, Huntingdon County, as the Captain Joseph S. Giacobello Memorial Bridge; designating a bridge on that portion of State Route 2016 over the Casselman River in Rockwood Borough, Somerset County, as the PFC Alton Glenn Sterner Memorial Bridge; and designating a bridge on that portion of Pennsylvania Route 96 over the Little Wills Creek, Bedford County, as the Staff Sgt. Roger (Rod) Guy Holler Memorial Bridge.
Title
Designating a bridge on that portion of State Route 3016 (Bedford Street) over Solomon Run in the City of Johnstown, Cambria County, as the Seaman Apprentice Kenneth D. Scaife Memorial Bridge; designating a bridge on that portion of Peg Run Road, Pennsylvania Route 240, over the West Branch of the Susquehanna River, Susquehanna Township, Cambria County, as the United States Army Sergeant Scott O. Henry Memorial Bridge; designating a portion of U.S. Route 220 in Sullivan County from the intersection with Pennsylvania Route 87 to the Bradford County line as the T.W. "Doc" Shoemaker Memorial Highway; designating a bridge on that portion of Pennsylvania Route 14 over Fall Brook, Troy Borough, Bradford County, as the Troy Area Veterans Memorial Bridge; designating a bridge on that portion of Pennsylvania Route 305 over Shaver's Creek in Barree Township, Huntingdon County, as the Private Harold E. "Jim" Knode Memorial Bridge; designating a bridge on that portion of Pennsylvania Route 453 over the Little Juniata River, Tyrone Township, Blair County, as the Robert E. Gensimore Memorial Bridge; designating a bridge on that portion of Pennsylvania Route 899 over the Clarion River connecting Barnett Township, Jefferson County, and Barnett Township, Forest County, as the PFC Patrick T. Cassatt Memorial Bridge; designating a bridge on that portion of State Route 4018 over the Little Mahoning Creek, South Mahoning Township, Indiana County, as the SP4 Franklin Delano Meyer Memorial Bridge; designating a bridge identified as Bridge Key 54683 on that portion of State Route 3009 (Kushequa Avenue) over the Kinzua Creek in Kushequa, Hamlin Township, McKean County, as the Vietnam Veterans Memorial Bridge; designating the bridge identified as Bridge Key 18676 on that portion of Pennsylvania Route 747 over the Juniata River in Mount Union Borough, Huntingdon County, as the Captain Joseph S. Giacobello Memorial Bridge; designating a bridge on that portion of State Route 2016 over the Casselman River in Rockwood Borough, Somerset County, as the PFC Alton Glenn Sterner Memorial Bridge; and designating a bridge on that portion of Pennsylvania Route 96 over the Little Wills Creek, Bedford County, as the Staff Sgt. Roger (Rod) Guy Holler Memorial Bridge.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 117 PN 1034, CONCUR IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-24 - House - House Floor: SB 117 PN 1034, FP (Y: 199 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - House - House Floor: SB 117 PN 85, 2019 A2033, PICKETT (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 117 PN 85, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-24 - House - House Floor: SB 117 PN 1034, FP (Y: 199 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - House - House Floor: SB 117 PN 85, 2019 A2033, PICKETT (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 117 PN 85, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-02 | Senate | Act No. 59 |
2019-07-02 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Signed in House |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments (50-0) |
2019-06-25 | Senate | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2019-06-24 | Senate | Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS |
2019-06-24 | Senate | In the Senate |
2019-06-24 | House | Third consideration and final passage (199-0) |
2019-06-20 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2019-06-19 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-06-19 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2019-06-18 | House | Removed from table |
2019-06-10 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-06-10 | House | First consideration |
2019-06-10 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-03-25 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2019-03-19 | House | In the House |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (45-0) |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Second consideration |
2019-02-05 | Senate | First consideration |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |