PA SB114 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-6)
Status: Engrossed on January 18 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-10-31 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 18 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-10-31 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, in terms and courses of study, further providing for firefighter and emergency service training and establishing the Secondary Education Fire Training Pilot Program and the Fire Training Fund.
Title
In terms and courses of study, further providing for firefighter and emergency service training and establishing the Secondary Education Fire Training Pilot Program and the Fire Training Fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-10-31 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-31 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Adopt Amendment A02761 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - House - House Education: Re-refer Bill To Another Committee (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-18 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 114 PN 18, Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-10 - Senate - Senate Education: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-31 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Adopt Amendment A02761 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - House - House Education: Re-refer Bill To Another Committee (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-18 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 114 PN 18, Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-10 - Senate - Senate Education: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-31 | House | Laid on the table |
2023-10-31 | House | First consideration |
2023-10-31 | House | Reported as amended |
2023-04-24 | House | Re-referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |
2023-04-24 | House | Reported with request to re-refer to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |
2023-03-07 | House | Referred to EDUCATION |
2023-01-18 | House | In the House |
2023-01-18 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2023-01-18 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2023-01-11 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2023-01-11 | Senate | Second consideration |
2023-01-10 | Senate | First consideration |
2023-01-10 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2023-01-09 | Senate | Referred to EDUCATION |