PA SB114 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on October 21 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-18 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 21 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-18 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 75 (Vehicles) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in miscellaneous provisions, further providing for snow and ice dislodged or falling from moving vehicle.
Title
In miscellaneous provisions, further providing for snow and ice dislodged or falling from moving vehicle.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-03 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment A04641 (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment A04577 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 114 PN 83, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment A04577 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 114 PN 83, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-18 | House | Removed from table |
2020-04-28 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-04-28 | House | Removed from table |
2020-02-03 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-02-03 | House | First consideration |
2020-02-03 | House | Reported as amended |
2019-10-22 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2019-10-21 | House | In the House |
2019-10-21 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2019-09-23 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Second consideration |
2019-06-18 | Senate | First consideration |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |