PA SB114 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-02 - Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-02 - Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 53 (Municipalities Generally) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in municipal authorities, further providing for purposes and powers.
Title
In municipal authorities, further providing for purposes and powers.
Sponsors
Sen. John Eichelberger [R] | Sen. Christine Tartaglione [D] | Sen. Robert Mensch [R] | Sen. John Rafferty [R] |
Sen. Donald White [R] | Sen. James Brewster [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 114 PN 88, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-02 | House | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2018-03-26 | House | In the House |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Second consideration |
2018-01-30 | Senate | First consideration |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2017-01-13 | Senate | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |