PA SB113 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Engrossed on November 15 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-17 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 15 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-17 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 20 (Decedents, Estates and Fiduciaries) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in incapacitated persons, providing for communication, visitation and interaction with other persons and for notice to immediate family of certain events.
Title
In incapacitated persons, providing for communication, visitation and interaction with other persons and for notice to immediate family of certain events.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-11-15 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 113 PN 987, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-17 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2017-11-15 | House | In the House |
2017-11-15 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2017-10-23 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2017-06-20 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2017-06-20 | Senate | Second consideration, with amendments |
2017-06-19 | Senate | Removed from table |
2017-06-19 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2017-05-09 | Senate | First consideration |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2017-01-13 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |