PA SB1118 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on October 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-12 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-12 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of February 18, 1998 (P.L.146, No.22), known as the Check Casher Licensing Act, further providing for definitions, for authority of the department, for conditions for licensing and for fees and charges; and providing for recovery of losses due to fraudulent misrepresentation.
Title
Further providing for definitions, for authority of the department, for conditions for licensing and for fees and charges; and providing for recovery of losses due to fraudulent misrepresentation.
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Brubaker [R] | Sen. Donald White [R] | Sen. John Wozniak [D] | Sen. Lisa Boscola [D] |
Sen. Robert Mensch [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-10-22 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-12 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Removed from table |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2013-12-09 | Senate | Removed from table |
2013-12-09 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2013-10-22 | Senate | First consideration |
2013-10-22 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2013-10-09 | Senate | Referred to BANKING AND INSURANCE |