PA SB1115 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-4)
Status: Passed on June 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-26 - Act No. 82
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-4)
Status: Passed on June 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-26 - Act No. 82
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 51 (Military Affairs) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in educational assistance program, further providing for definitions and for amount of grants.
Title
In educational assistance program, further providing for definitions and for amount of grants.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-17 - Senate - Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-11-18 - Senate - SB 1115 PN 1458, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-11-12 - Senate - Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-10-22 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-11-18 - Senate - SB 1115 PN 1458, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-11-12 - Senate - Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-10-22 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-26 | Senate | Act No. 82 |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2014-06-19 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2014-06-19 | Senate | Signed in House |
2014-06-18 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2014-06-18 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments (50-0) |
2014-06-17 | Senate | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS |
2014-06-10 | Senate | In the Senate |
2014-06-10 | House | Third consideration and final passage (199-0) |
2014-06-10 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2014-06-09 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2014-06-09 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2014-06-03 | House | Removed from table |
2014-04-30 | House | Laid on the table |
2014-04-30 | House | First consideration |
2014-04-30 | House | Reported as committed |
2013-11-19 | House | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |
2013-11-18 | House | In the House |
2013-11-18 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2013-11-13 | Senate | Second consideration |
2013-11-12 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2013-10-23 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2013-10-22 | Senate | First consideration |
2013-10-22 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2013-10-09 | Senate | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |