PA SB1096 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-09 - Act No. 120
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-09 - Act No. 120
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 26 (Eminent Domain) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, further providing for limited reimbursement of appraisal, attorney and engineering fees.
Title
Further providing for limited reimbursement of appraisal, attorney and engineering fees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-17 - Senate - Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-03 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-03 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-09 | House | Act No. 120 |
2014-07-09 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2014-06-30 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2014-06-29 | House | Signed in House |
2014-06-29 | House | Signed in Senate |
2014-06-27 | House | Third consideration and final passage (179-23) |
2014-06-18 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2014-06-17 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2014-06-17 | House | Second consideration |
2014-06-16 | House | Removed from table |
2014-06-11 | House | Laid on the table |
2014-06-11 | House | First consideration |
2014-06-11 | House | Reported as committed |
2014-04-10 | House | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2014-04-09 | House | In the House |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Second consideration |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Re-reported as amended |
2013-12-11 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2013-12-03 | Senate | First consideration |
2013-12-03 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2013-09-27 | Senate | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |