PA SB1095 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-3)
Status: Enrolled on October 16 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-10-16 - Presented to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, in preliminary provisions, further providing for Keystone Exams.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In preliminary provisions, further providing for Keystone Exams.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-10-15 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-15 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1095 PN 1994, CONCUR IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-09 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-09 - House - House Floor: SB 1095 PN 1994, FP (Y: 191 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-09-24 - House - House Education: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-24 - House - House Education: Adopt Amendment A09374 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1095 PN 1894, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Senate - Senate Education: Reported as Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-10-16SenatePresented to the Governor
2018-10-16SenateSigned in House
2018-10-15SenateSigned in Senate
2018-10-15SenateSenate concurred in House amendments (49-0)
2018-10-15SenateRe-reported on concurrence, as committed
2018-10-12SenateReferred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS
2018-10-09SenateIn the Senate
2018-10-09HouseThird consideration and final passage (191-0)
2018-10-09HouseRe-reported as committed
2018-10-01HouseRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2018-10-01HouseSecond consideration
2018-09-25HouseRemoved from table
2018-09-24HouseLaid on the table
2018-09-24HouseFirst consideration
2018-09-24HouseReported as amended
2018-06-25HouseReferred to EDUCATION
2018-06-22HouseIn the House
2018-06-22SenateThird consideration and final passage (49-0)
2018-06-21SenateRe-reported as committed
2018-06-19SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2018-06-19SenateSecond consideration, with amendments
2018-06-13SenateFirst consideration
2018-06-13SenateReported as amended
2018-04-06SenateReferred to EDUCATION

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=S&type=B&bn=1095
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=1095&pn=1621
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=1095&pn=1877
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=1095&pn=1894
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=1095&pn=1994
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=23&theDate=06/13/2018&RollCallId=956
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=06/21/2018&RollCallId=1034
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=614
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=12&theDate=09/24/2018&RollCallId=1893
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=12&theDate=09/24/2018&RollCallId=1894
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1508
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=10/09/2018&RollCallId=2032
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=689
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=17&theDate=10/15/2018&RollCallId=1187

Bill Comments

feedback