PA SB108 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-10-12 - Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS
Pending: Senate Rules & Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 20 (Decedents, Estates and Fiduciaries) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in anatomical gifts, further providing for manner of executing anatomical gifts and for Governor Robert P. Casey Memorial Organ and Tissue Donation Awareness Trust Fund contributions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In anatomical gifts, further providing for manner of executing anatomical gifts and for Governor Robert P. Casey Memorial Organ and Tissue Donation Awareness Trust Fund contributions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-10-10 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-10 - House - House Floor: SB 108 PN 1659, FP (Y: 193 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - House - House Floor: SB 108 PN 1529, 2017 A6317, PETRARCA (Y: 192 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A05794 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 108 PN 82, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-10-12SenateReferred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS
2018-10-10SenateIn the Senate
2018-10-10HouseThird consideration and final passage (193-0)
2018-10-10HouseRe-reported as committed
2018-04-17HouseRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2018-04-17HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2018-03-14HouseRemoved from table
2018-03-13HouseLaid on the table
2018-03-13HouseFirst consideration
2018-03-13HouseReported as amended
2017-05-24HouseReferred to JUDICIARY
2017-05-22HouseIn the House
2017-05-22SenateThird consideration and final passage (50-0)
2017-05-09SenateSecond consideration
2017-03-28SenateFirst consideration
2017-03-28SenateReported as committed
2017-01-13SenateReferred to JUDICIARY

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=S&type=B&bn=108
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0108&pn=0082
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0108&pn=1529
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0108&pn=1659
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=39&theDate=03/28/2017&RollCallId=80
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=104
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=24&theDate=03/13/2018&RollCallId=1309
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=24&theDate=03/13/2018&RollCallId=1308
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1130
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1521
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=10/10/2018&RollCallId=2052

Bill Comments

feedback