PA SB1069 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on October 16 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-10-18 - Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 16 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-10-18 - Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of July 28, 1953 (P.L.723, No.230), known as the Second Class County Code, providing for the voluntary dissolution of the existing form of governance of a municipal corporation located in a county of the second class and the creation of unincorporated districts of counties of the second class; authorizing the county to assume responsibility for the governance of the municipal corporation and delivery of public services to the citizens residing in the municipal corporation through the administration of an unincorporated district; and authorizing unincorporated district advisory committees.
Title
Providing for the voluntary dissolution of the existing form of governance of a municipal corporation located in a county of the second class and the creation of unincorporated districts of counties of the second class; authorizing the county to assume responsibility for the governance of the municipal corporation and delivery of public services to the citizens residing in the municipal corporation through the administration of an unincorporated district; and authorizing unincorporated district advisory committees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-10-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1069 PN 1537, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-15 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-26 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-15 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-26 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-10-18 | House | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2018-10-16 | House | In the House |
2018-10-16 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2018-10-15 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2018-10-02 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2018-10-02 | Senate | Second consideration |
2018-09-26 | Senate | First consideration |
2018-09-26 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |