PA SB106 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-07-11 - Pamphlet Laws Resolution No. 1 of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-07-11 - Pamphlet Laws Resolution No. 1 of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
A Joint Resolution proposing separate and distinct amendments to the Constitution of the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, providing that there is no constitutional right to taxpayer-funded abortion or other right relating to abortion; further providing for action on concurrent orders and resolutions, for Lieutenant Governor and for qualifications of electors; and providing for election audits.
Title
A Joint Resolution proposing separate and distinct amendments to the Constitution of the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, providing that there is no constitutional right to taxpayer-funded abortion or other right relating to abortion; further providing for action on concurrent orders and resolutions, for Lieutenant Governor and for qualifications of electors; and providing for election audits.
Sponsors
Sen. David Argall [R] | Sen. Scott Martin [R] | Sen. Patrick Stefano [R] | Sen. Kristin Phillips-Hill [R] |
Sen. Giovanni DiSanto [R] | Sen. Doug Mastriano [R] | Sen. Joe Pittman [R] | Sen. Michael Regan [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-07-08 - House - House Floor: SB 106 PN 1857, CONCUR (Y: 107 N: 92 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-07-08 - House - House Floor: SB 106 PN 1857, 2021 A5440, SUSP RULES (Y: 86 N: 113 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2022-07-08 - House - House Floor: SB 106 PN 1857, 2021 A5421, SUSP RULES (Y: 86 N: 114 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2022-07-08 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 18 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-07-08 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 106 PN 1857, Concurrence in House Amendments as Amended (Y: 28 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-07-07 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-07-07 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Adopt Amendment A05334 (Y: 11 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-15 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-15 - House - House Floor: SB 106 PN 1279, FP (Y: 113 N: 87 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-12-14 - House - House Floor: SB 106 PN 71, 2021 A3174 (Y: 114 N: 89 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-14 - House - House Floor: SB 106 PN 71, 2021 A3173 (Y: 114 N: 89 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-14 - House - House Floor: SB 106 PN 71, 2021 A3169 (Y: 113 N: 90 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-14 - House - House Floor: SB 106 PN 71, 2021 A3168 (Y: 113 N: 90 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-14 - House - House Floor: SB 106 PN 71, 2021 A3123 (Y: 203 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 14 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 106 PN 71, Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-07-08 - House - House Floor: SB 106 PN 1857, 2021 A5440, SUSP RULES (Y: 86 N: 113 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2022-07-08 - House - House Floor: SB 106 PN 1857, 2021 A5421, SUSP RULES (Y: 86 N: 114 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2022-07-08 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 18 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-07-08 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 106 PN 1857, Concurrence in House Amendments as Amended (Y: 28 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-07-07 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-07-07 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Adopt Amendment A05334 (Y: 11 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-15 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-15 - House - House Floor: SB 106 PN 1279, FP (Y: 113 N: 87 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-12-14 - House - House Floor: SB 106 PN 71, 2021 A3174 (Y: 114 N: 89 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-14 - House - House Floor: SB 106 PN 71, 2021 A3173 (Y: 114 N: 89 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-14 - House - House Floor: SB 106 PN 71, 2021 A3169 (Y: 113 N: 90 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-14 - House - House Floor: SB 106 PN 71, 2021 A3168 (Y: 113 N: 90 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-14 - House - House Floor: SB 106 PN 71, 2021 A3123 (Y: 203 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 14 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 106 PN 71, Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-11 | House | Pamphlet Laws Resolution No. 1 of 2022 |
2022-07-11 | House | Filed in the Office of the Secretary of the Commonwealth |
2022-07-08 | House | Signed in House |
2022-07-08 | House | Signed in Senate |
2022-07-08 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments to House amendments (107-92) |
2022-07-08 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2022-07-08 | House | Referred to RULES |
2022-07-08 | House | In the House |
2022-07-08 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments, as amended by the Senate (28-22) |
2022-07-07 | Senate | Re-reported on concurrence, as amended |
2021-12-15 | Senate | Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS |
2021-12-15 | Senate | In the Senate |
2021-12-15 | House | Third consideration and final passage (113-87) |
2021-12-15 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2021-12-14 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-12-14 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2021-12-13 | House | Removed from table |
2021-09-20 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-09-20 | House | Removed from table |
2021-05-25 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-05-25 | House | First consideration |
2021-05-25 | House | Reported as committed |
2021-04-29 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |
2021-04-27 | House | In the House |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (43-4) |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Removed from table |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Second consideration |
2021-01-27 | Senate | First consideration |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |