PA SB1057 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-17 - Referred to PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE
Pending: House Professional Licensure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-17 - Referred to PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE
Pending: House Professional Licensure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending the act of December 22, 1983 (P.L.306, No.84), known as the Board of Vehicles Act, further providing for definitions, for licensure and for State Board of Vehicle Manufacturers, Dealers and Salespersons.
Title
Further providing for definitions, for licensure and for State Board of Vehicle Manufacturers, Dealers and Salespersons.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-06-15 - Senate - SB 1057 PN 1349, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-17 | Referred to PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE | |
2010-06-15 | In the House | |
2010-06-15 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2010-06-09 | Second consideration | |
2010-06-07 | Re-reported as committed | |
2010-03-08 | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2010-01-26 | First consideration | |
2010-01-26 | Reported as committed | |
2009-07-27 | Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |