PA SB1052 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-16 - Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-16 - Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 53 (Municipalities Generally) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in general provisions, further providing for scope of subchapter, providing for definitions, further providing for establishment and designation, providing for emergency meetings by authorized telecommunications device, repealing provisions relating to exercise of powers and functions, further providing for declaration of policy and for definitions, repealing provisions relating to enabling authority for emergency interim successors for local offices, further providing for emergency interim successors for local officers and for succession period and repealing provisions relating to term and removal of designees.
Title
In general provisions, further providing for scope of subchapter, providing for definitions, further providing for establishment and designation, providing for emergency meetings by authorized telecommunications device, repealing provisions relating to exercise of powers and functions, further providing for declaration of policy and for definitions, repealing provisions relating to enabling authority for emergency interim successors for local offices, further providing for emergency interim successors for local officers and for succession period and repealing provisions relating to term and removal of designees.
Sponsors
Sen. Scott Hutchinson [R] | Sen. Judith Ward [R] | Sen. Cris Dush [R] | Sen. Judy Schwank [D] |
Sen. Timothy Kearney [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-15 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1052 PN 1715, Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-13 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-07 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Adopt Amendment A04391 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-07 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-13 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-07 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Adopt Amendment A04391 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-07 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-16 | House | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2022-06-15 | House | In the House |
2022-06-15 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2022-06-13 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2022-06-08 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-06-08 | Senate | Second consideration |
2022-06-07 | Senate | First consideration |
2022-06-07 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |