PA SB1045 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-12-17 - Act No. 82
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-12-17 - Act No. 82
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 51 (Military Affairs) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in general provisions, providing for character of discharge.
Title
In general provisions, providing for character of discharge.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-12-02 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-02 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-02 - House - House Floor: SB 1045 PN 1370, FP (Y: 191 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2015-11-23 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-23 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1045 PN 1370, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-27 - Senate - Senate Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Reported as Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-27 - Senate - Senate Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Reported as Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-02 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-02 - House - House Floor: SB 1045 PN 1370, FP (Y: 191 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2015-11-23 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-23 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1045 PN 1370, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-27 - Senate - Senate Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Reported as Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-27 - Senate - Senate Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Reported as Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-17 | House | Act No. 82 |
2015-12-17 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2015-12-07 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2015-12-05 | House | Signed in House |
2015-12-04 | House | Signed in Senate |
2015-12-02 | House | Third consideration and final passage (191-0) |
2015-12-02 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2015-12-01 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2015-12-01 | House | Second consideration |
2015-11-24 | House | Removed from table |
2015-11-23 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-11-23 | House | First consideration |
2015-11-23 | House | Reported as committed |
2015-11-19 | House | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |
2015-11-17 | House | In the House |
2015-11-17 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2015-11-16 | Senate | Second consideration |
2015-10-27 | Senate | First consideration |
2015-10-27 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2015-10-23 | Senate | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |