PA SB1037 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 12-1)
Status: Engrossed on September 21 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-09-29 - Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 21 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-09-29 - Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 44 (Law and Justice) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in other officers and officials, providing for coroners; and making a related repeal.
Title
In other officers and officials, providing for coroners; and making a related repeal.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-09-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1037 PN 1933, Final Passage (Y: 31 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-09-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1037 PN 1545, 2021 A5640, REGAN Amendment No. A-5640 (Y: 46 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-09-20 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 19 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Senate - Senate Law And Justice: Adopt Amendment A03851 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Senate - Senate Law And Justice: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-09-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1037 PN 1545, 2021 A5640, REGAN Amendment No. A-5640 (Y: 46 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-09-20 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 19 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Senate - Senate Law And Justice: Adopt Amendment A03851 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Senate - Senate Law And Justice: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-29 | House | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2022-09-21 | House | In the House |
2022-09-21 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (31-19) |
2022-09-21 | Senate | Amended on third consideration (46-3) |
2022-09-20 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Second consideration |
2022-04-05 | Senate | First consideration |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Referred to LAW AND JUSTICE |