PA SB1026 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on July 11 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-07-11 - Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY
Pending: House Labor And Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 11 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-07-11 - Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY
Pending: House Labor And Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of December 19, 1975 (P.L.604, No.173), entitled "An act to facilitate the use of electronic funds transfer systems by providing that credits to accounts in financial institutions designated by recipients shall satisfy legal requirements for payments by cash or checks," further providing for electronic funds transfers, for consumer protections and for payroll card accounts.
Title
Amending the act of December 19, 1975 (P.L.604, No.173), entitled "An act to facilitate the use of electronic funds transfer systems by providing that credits to accounts in financial institutions designated by recipients shall satisfy legal requirements for payments by cash or checks," further providing for electronic funds transfers, for consumer protections and for payroll card accounts.
Sponsors
Sen. Nicholas Miller [D] | Sen. Lisa Baker [R] | Sen. Chris Gebhard [R] | Sen. Wayne Fontana [D] |
Sen. Jay Costa [D] | Sen. Amanda Cappelletti [D] | Sen. Sharif Street [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-07-11 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1026 PN 1592, Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-07-10 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-08 - Senate - Senate Labor And Industry: Adopt Amendment A04309 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-08 - Senate - Senate Labor And Industry: Adopt Amendment A04405 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-08 - Senate - Senate Labor And Industry: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-07-10 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-08 - Senate - Senate Labor And Industry: Adopt Amendment A04309 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-08 - Senate - Senate Labor And Industry: Adopt Amendment A04405 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-08 - Senate - Senate Labor And Industry: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-11 | House | Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY |
2024-07-11 | House | In the House |
2024-07-11 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (44-5) |
2024-07-10 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2024-07-09 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2024-07-09 | Senate | Second consideration |
2024-06-27 | Senate | Removed from table |
2024-06-27 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2024-05-08 | Senate | First consideration |
2024-05-08 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2024-01-05 | Senate | Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY |