PA SB1022 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-23 - Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-23 - Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending the act of February 1, 1966 (1965 P.L.1656, No.581), known as The Borough Code, repealing provisions relating to right of council to declare seat of member vacant for failure to attend meetings.
Title
Repealing provisions relating to right of council to declare seat of member vacant for failure to attend meetings.
Sponsors
Sen. John Eichelberger [R] | Sen. Edwin Erickson [R] | Sen. Robert Robbins [R] | Sen. Barry Stout [D] |
Sen. John Wozniak [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-03-22 - Senate - SB 1022 PN 1292, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-23 | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT | |
2010-03-22 | In the House | |
2010-03-22 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2010-03-15 | Second consideration | |
2010-02-02 | First consideration | |
2010-02-02 | Reported as committed | |
2009-07-10 | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |