PA SB1016 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-14 - Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
Pending: House Veterans Affairs & Emergency Preparedness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-14 - Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
Pending: House Veterans Affairs & Emergency Preparedness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 51 (Military Affairs) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in decorations, medals, badges and awards, further providing for authorized decorations, medals, badges and awards.
Title
In decorations, medals, badges and awards, further providing for authorized decorations, medals, badges and awards.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1016 PN 1320, Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-12 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-12 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-14 | House | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |
2022-04-13 | House | In the House |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Second consideration |
2022-02-07 | Senate | First consideration |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |