PA SB1010 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-3)
Status: Engrossed on June 26 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-06-27 - Referred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS
Pending: House Agriculture & Rural Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 26 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-06-27 - Referred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS
Pending: House Agriculture & Rural Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 75 (Vehicles) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, further providing for permit for movement during course of manufacture.
Title
Further providing for permit for movement during course of manufacture.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-26 - Senate - SB 1010 PN 1225, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-25 - Senate - Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-18 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-25 - Senate - Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-18 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-27 | House | Referred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS |
2013-06-26 | House | In the House |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2013-06-25 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2013-06-19 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2013-06-19 | Senate | Second consideration |
2013-06-18 | Senate | First consideration |
2013-06-18 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2013-06-17 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |