PA SB101 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 23-5)
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-06-03 - Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-06-03 - Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending Title 65 (Public Officers) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, further providing for a penalty.
Title
Further providing for a penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-06-01 - Senate - SB 101 PN 178, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-03 | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT | |
2009-06-01 | In the House | |
2009-06-01 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2009-05-06 | Second consideration | |
2009-04-28 | First consideration | |
2009-04-28 | Reported as committed | |
2009-02-06 | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |