PA SB1001 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 9 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-09 - Act No. 119
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 9 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-09 - Act No. 119
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 57 (Notaries Public) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in revised uniform law on notarial acts, further providing for appointment and commission as notary public, qualifications and no immunity or benefit and for regulations; and further providing for application for appointment to the office of notary public.
Title
In revised uniform law on notarial acts, further providing for appointment and commission as notary public, qualifications and no immunity or benefit and for regulations; and further providing for application for appointment to the office of notary public.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-07-01 - Senate - Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-06 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-06 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-09 | Senate | Act No. 119 |
2014-07-09 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2014-07-01 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2014-07-01 | Senate | Signed in House |
2014-07-01 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2014-07-01 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments (48-2) |
2014-07-01 | Senate | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2014-07-01 | Senate | Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS |
2014-07-01 | Senate | In the Senate |
2014-07-01 | House | Third consideration and final passage (203-0) |
2014-07-01 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2014-06-30 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2014-06-30 | House | Second consideration |
2014-06-29 | House | Removed from table |
2014-06-17 | House | Laid on the table |
2014-06-17 | House | First consideration |
2014-06-17 | House | Reported as amended |
2014-06-06 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2014-06-04 | House | In the House |
2014-06-04 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (45-1) |
2014-06-03 | Senate | Amended on third consideration |
2014-06-02 | Senate | Amended on third consideration |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Second consideration |
2014-05-06 | Senate | First consideration |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2013-06-17 | Senate | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |