PA SB1000 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on September 28 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-12-07 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on September 28 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-12-07 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to provide from the General Fund for the expenses of the Executive and Judicial Departments, the State Government Support Agencies and the General Assembly of the Commonwealth, the public debt and the public schools for the fiscal year July 1, 2015, to June 30, 2016, for certain institutions and organizations, and for the payment of bills incurred and remaining unpaid at the close of the fiscal year ending June 30, 2015; to provide appropriations from the State Lottery Fund, the Tobacco Settlement Fund, the Aviation Restricted Account, the Hazardous Material Response Fund, The State Stores Fund, the Milk Marketing Fund, the Home Investment Trust Fund, the Emergency Medical Services Operating Fund, the Tuition Account Guaranteed Savings Program Fund, the Banking Fund, the Firearm Records Check Fund, the Ben Franklin Technology Development Authority Fund, the Oil and Gas Lease Fund, the Home Improvement Account, the Cigarette Fire Safety and Firefighter Protection Act Enforcement Fund, the Insurance Regulation and Oversight Fund, the Pennsylvania Racehorse Development Restricted Receipt Account, the Justice Reinvestment Fund and the Multimodal Transportation Fund to the Executive Department; to provide appropriations from the Judicial Computer System Augmentation Account to the Judicial Department for the fiscal year July 1, 2015, to June 30, 2016; to provide appropriations from the Motor License Fund for the fiscal year July 1, 2015, to June 30, 2016, for the proper operation of several departments of the Commonwealth and the Pennsylvania State Police authorized to spend Motor License Fund money; and to provide for the appropriation of Federal funds to the Executive Department of the Commonwealth and for the payment of bills remaining unpaid at the close of the fiscal year ending June 30, 2015.
Title
To provide from the General Fund for the expenses of the Executive and Judicial Departments, the State Government Support Agencies and the General Assembly of the Commonwealth, the public debt and the public schools for the fiscal year July 1, 2015, to June 30, 2016, for certain institutions and organizations, and for the payment of bills incurred and remaining unpaid at the close of the fiscal year ending June 30, 2015; to provide appropriations from the State Lottery Fund, the Tobacco Settlement Fund, the Aviation Restricted Account, the Hazardous Material Response Fund, The State Stores Fund, the Milk Marketing Fund, the Home Investment Trust Fund, the Emergency Medical Services Operating Fund, the Tuition Account Guaranteed Savings Program Fund, the Banking Fund, the Firearm Records Check Fund, the Ben Franklin Technology Development Authority Fund, the Oil and Gas Lease Fund, the Home Improvement Account, the Cigarette Fire Safety and Firefighter Protection Act Enforcement Fund, the Insurance Regulation and Oversight Fund, the Pennsylvania Racehorse Development Restricted Receipt Account, the Justice Reinvestment Fund and the Multimodal Transportation Fund to the Executive Department; to provide appropriations from the Judicial Computer System Augmentation Account to the Judicial Department for the fiscal year July 1, 2015, to June 30, 2016; to provide appropriations from the Motor License Fund for the fiscal year July 1, 2015, to June 30, 2016, for the proper operation of several departments of the Commonwealth and the Pennsylvania State Police authorized to spend Motor License Fund money; and to provide for the appropriation of Federal funds to the Executive Department of the Commonwealth and for the payment of bills remaining unpaid at the close of the fiscal year ending June 30, 2015.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-10-28 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1000 PN 1232, MOTION TO OVERRIDE GOVERNOR'S VETO MESSAGE (Y: 30 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-24 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-24 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-24 - House - House Floor: SB 1000 PN 1232, FP (Y: 117 N: 83 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-09-21 - House - House Appropriations: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-21 - House - House Appropriations: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1000 PN 1232, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 30 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Reported as Committed (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Reported as Committed (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-24 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-24 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-24 - House - House Floor: SB 1000 PN 1232, FP (Y: 117 N: 83 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-09-21 - House - House Appropriations: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-21 - House - House Appropriations: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1000 PN 1232, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 30 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Reported as Committed (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Reported as Committed (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-07 | Senate | Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9) |
2015-10-28 | Senate | Motion to reconsider the vote by which Senate failed to re-pass the bill, which had been disapproved by the Governor |
2015-10-28 | Senate | Motion to override the Governor's Veto defeated, and the Governor's Veto sustained Oct. 28, 2015 (30-19) |
2015-10-27 | Senate | Bill, together with Governor's Veto Message, removed from table |
2015-09-29 | Senate | Bill, together with Governor's Veto Message, laid on the table |
2015-09-29 | Senate | In the Senate |
2015-09-29 | House | Veto No. 7 |
2015-09-29 | House | Vetoed by the Governor |
2015-09-28 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2015-09-24 | House | Signed in House |
2015-09-28 | House | Signed in Senate |
2015-09-24 | House | Third consideration and final passage (117-83) |
2015-09-24 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2015-09-22 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2015-09-22 | House | Second consideration |
2015-09-21 | House | Removed from table |
2015-09-21 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-09-21 | House | First consideration |
2015-09-21 | House | Reported as committed |
2015-09-21 | House | Referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2015-09-18 | House | In the House |
2015-09-18 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (30-19) |
2015-09-17 | Senate | Second consideration |
2015-09-16 | Senate | First consideration |
2015-09-16 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2015-09-15 | Senate | Referred to APPROPRIATIONS |