PA SB10 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 22-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-10-11 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An act amending Title 29 (Federal Relations) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, providing for immigration preemption and cooperation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act amending Title 29 (Federal Relations) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, providing for immigration preemption and cooperation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-10-10 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 19 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-10 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A09939 (Y: 20 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 10 PN 295, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 37 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 10 PN 295, A161, HUGHES AMENDMENT NO. A-0161 (Y: 13 N: 36 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 10 PN 295, A163, HUGHES AMENDMENT NO. A-0163 (Y: 15 N: 34 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 10 PN 295, A170, SABATINA AMENDMENT NO. A-0170 (Y: 15 N: 34 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 10 PN 295, A165, BLAKE AMENDMENT NO. A-0165 (Y: 13 N: 36 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 10 PN 295, A162, HUGHES AMENDMENT NO. A-00162 (Y: 13 N: 36 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 17 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Reported as Amended (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-10-11HouseRemoved from table
2018-10-10HouseLaid on the table
2018-10-10HouseFirst consideration
2018-10-10HouseReported as amended
2017-02-10HouseReferred to JUDICIARY
2017-02-07HouseIn the House
2017-02-07SenateThird consideration and final passage (37-12)
2017-02-06SenateRe-reported as amended
2017-02-06SenateRe-referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS
2017-02-06SenateSecond consideration
2017-02-06SenateRe-reported as committed
2017-01-30SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2017-01-25SenateFirst consideration
2017-01-25SenateReported as amended
2017-01-20SenateReferred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=S&type=B&bn=10
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0010&pn=0143
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0010&pn=0162
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0010&pn=0295
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0010&pn=2096
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=15&theDate=01/25/2017&RollCallId=16
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=02/06/2017&RollCallId=37
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=17&theDate=02/06/2017&RollCallId=41
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=19
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=20
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=21
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=22
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=23
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=24
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=24&theDate=10/10/2018&RollCallId=2035
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=24&theDate=10/10/2018&RollCallId=2036

Bill Comments

feedback