PA SB10 | 2007-2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 20-9)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2007 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2007-02-26 - Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2007 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2007-02-26 - Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
Summary
An Act amending the act of July 31, 2003 (P.L.73, No.17), known as the Volunteer Fire Company and Volunteer Ambulance Service Grant Act, further providing for guidelines and procedures, for award of grants and for expiration of authority; providing for publication and notice, for special provisions and for a Legislative Budget and Finance Committee performance review; and repealing an obsolete act.
Title
An Act amending the act of July 31, 2003 (P.L.73, No.17), known as the Volunteer Fire Company and Volunteer Ambulance Service Grant Act, further providing for guidelines and procedures, for award of grants and for expiration of authority; providing for publication and notice, for special provisions and for a Legislative Budget and Finance Committee performance review; and repealing an obsolete act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2007-02-26 | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS | |
2007-02-13 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2007-02-12 | Amended on third consideration | |
2007-02-06 | Second consideration | |
2007-02-05 | Re-reported as committed | |
2007-01-31 | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2007-01-30 | First consideration | |
2007-01-30 | Reported as committed | |
2007-01-29 | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |
Pennsylvania State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2007&sind=0&body=S&type=B&bn=10 |