PA HR83 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-10-17 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A Resolution directing the Legislative Budget and Finance Committee to study vote-recording systems for the House of Representatives.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Directing the Legislative Budget and Finance Committee to study vote-recording systems for the House of Representatives.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-19 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 19 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-10-17HouseRemoved from table
2018-10-17HouseLaid on the table
2018-06-21HouseRemoved from table
2018-06-21HouseLaid on the table
2018-04-30HouseRemoved from table
2018-04-30HouseLaid on the table
2018-01-02HouseRemoved from table
2018-01-02HouseLaid on the table
2017-10-18HouseRemoved from table
2017-10-18HouseLaid on the table
2017-07-11HouseRemoved from table
2017-07-11HouseLaid on the table
2017-06-13HouseRemoved from table
2017-06-13HouseLaid on the table
2017-04-19HouseReported as committed
2017-02-10HouseReferred to STATE GOVERNMENT

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback