PA HR828 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-17 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-17 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A Resolution designating the month of October 2020 as "Archives Month" in Pennsylvania.
Title
Designating the month of October 2020 as "Archives Month" in Pennsylvania.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-09 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-17 | House | Removed from table |
2020-11-17 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-09-11 | House | Removed from table |
2020-09-11 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-06-09 | House | Reported as committed |
2020-03-13 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |