PA HR827 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-18 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-18 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A Resolution designating October 24, 2020, as "Acupuncture and Oriental Medicine Day" in Pennsylvania to honor the more than 700 licensed acupuncturists in this Commonwealth.
Title
Designating October 24, 2020, as "Acupuncture and Oriental Medicine Day" in Pennsylvania to honor the more than 700 licensed acupuncturists in this Commonwealth.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-09-15 - House - House Professional Licensure: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-18 | House | Removed from table |
2020-11-18 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-09-15 | House | Reported as committed |
2020-03-13 | House | Referred to PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |