PA HR717 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 30-2)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-19 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-19 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A Resolution honoring the life of former President of the United States, Ronald Wilson Reagan.
Title
Honoring the life of former President of the United States, Ronald Wilson Reagan.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-04 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-19 | House | Removed from table |
2020-11-19 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-09-16 | House | Removed from table |
2020-09-16 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-06-15 | House | Removed from table |
2020-06-15 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-04-29 | House | Removed from table |
2020-04-29 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-02-04 | House | Reported as committed |
2020-02-03 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |