PA HR619 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-4)
Status: Passed on June 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-29 - Adopted (140-59)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-4)
Status: Passed on June 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-29 - Adopted (140-59)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A Resolution urging the Congress of the United States to lift the Federal ban on sports betting and to allow states that authorize, license and regulate casino gaming, including the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, to legalize sports betting through its licensed facilities.
Title
Urging the Congress of the United States to lift the Federal ban on sports betting and to allow states that authorize, license and regulate casino gaming, including the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, to legalize sports betting through its licensed facilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-29 - House - House Floor: HR 619 PN 2665 (Y: 140 N: 59 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - House - House Gaming Oversight: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - House - House Gaming Oversight: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - House - House Gaming Oversight: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - House - House Gaming Oversight: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-29 | House | Adopted (140-59) |
2016-06-14 | House | Removed from table |
2016-06-14 | House | Laid on the table |
2016-04-13 | House | Removed from table |
2016-04-13 | House | Laid on the table |
2016-02-09 | House | Reported as committed |
2015-12-14 | House | Referred to GAMING OVERSIGHT |