PA HR607 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-5)
Status: Introduced on November 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-01 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-01 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A Resolution designating December 1, 2019, as "Penske Truck Leasing Day" in Pennsylvania.
Title
Designating December 1, 2019, as "Penske Truck Leasing Day" in Pennsylvania.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-12-16 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-01 | House | Removed from table |
2020-10-01 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-07-08 | House | Removed from table |
2020-07-08 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-05-13 | House | Removed from table |
2020-05-13 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-03-25 | House | Removed from table |
2020-03-25 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-12-16 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-11-14 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |