PA HR459 | 2007-2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-13)
Status: Introduced on October 18 2007 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-11-13 - Removed from table
Status: Introduced on October 18 2007 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-11-13 - Removed from table
Summary
A Resolution directing the Legislative Budget and Finance Committee to study the fiscal impact of tax-exempt properties on the finances of municipalities and school districts; to review the policies of other states in addressing the burden of limited tax bases as a result of tax-exempt properties; and to make recommendations on ways to assist tax authorities with a high concentration of tax-exempt properties.
Title
A Resolution directing the Legislative Budget and Finance Committee to study the fiscal impact of tax-exempt properties on the finances of municipalities and school districts; to review the policies of other states in addressing the burden of limited tax bases as a result of tax-exempt properties; and to make recommendations on ways to assist tax authorities with a high concentration of tax-exempt properties.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-11-13 | Removed from table | |
2008-11-13 | Laid on the table | |
2008-07-01 | Removed from table | |
2008-07-01 | Laid on the table | |
2008-06-04 | Reported as amended | |
2007-10-18 | Referred to FINANCE |
Pennsylvania State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2007&sind=0&body=H&type=R&bn=459 |