PA HR408 | 2007-2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 43-8)
Status: Introduced on September 26 2007 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-11-13 - Removed from table
Status: Introduced on September 26 2007 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-11-13 - Removed from table
Summary
A Resolution directing the Legislative Budget and Finance Committee to conduct a study of the State Lottery relating to its ability to continue to support programs and services for older Pennsylvanians.
Title
A Resolution directing the Legislative Budget and Finance Committee to conduct a study of the State Lottery relating to its ability to continue to support programs and services for older Pennsylvanians.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-11-13 | Removed from table | |
2008-11-13 | Laid on the table | |
2008-07-01 | Removed from table | |
2008-07-01 | Laid on the table | |
2008-06-04 | Reported as committed | |
2007-09-26 | Referred to FINANCE |
Pennsylvania State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2007&sind=0&body=H&type=R&bn=408 |